|
10/05/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 529, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2976.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2516.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2021
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2021
|
From special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2021
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1540.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1428.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|