California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB939 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 5, 2021

Amended

Bill September 3, 2021
Bill May 17, 2021
Bill March 18, 2021