Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1622.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/09/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 8.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/08/2020
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|