07/20/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 92, Statutes of 2021. | |||
07/20/2021 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 07/15/2021 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 07/15/2021 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1993.) | ||
Senate | 07/14/2021 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2021 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2021 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2021 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2012.) | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 10). | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2021 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2021 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 12/08/2020 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 12/07/2020 | Introduced. To print. |