California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR1 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2020

Enrolled

Bill July 16, 2021

Chaptered

Bill July 20, 2021

Amended

Bill June 3, 2021
Bill February 4, 2021