|
07/12/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 101, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2022
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2022
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4131.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 3345.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2022
|
Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2022
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2022
|
Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2022
|
Assembly Rule 47.1 invoked. (Eduardo Garcia).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2021
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|