LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2021-2022 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR109
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR109
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2021-2022 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR109
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
August 30, 2021
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
June 29, 2022
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
July 12, 2022
Compare
Amended
Bill
June 2, 2022
Compare
Bill
January 12, 2022
Compare
Bill
January 3, 2022
Compare