03/08/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 15, Statutes of 2022. | |||
03/08/2022 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | |||
Assembly | 02/24/2022 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2022 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2987.) | ||
Senate | 02/24/2022 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/03/2022 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 3481.) | ||
Assembly | 02/03/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3415.) (January 27). | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/21/2022 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/20/2022 | Introduced. To print. |