1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 124 CHAPTER 15 Relative to National Passenger Safety Week. [ Approved by Governor March 08, 2022. Filed with Secretary of State March 08, 2022. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 124, Fong. National Passenger Safety Week.This measure would declare that passengers in motor vehicles should be educated and encouraged to advocate for their own safety and the safety of others during National Passenger Safety Week, the week of January 23 to 29, 2022, inclusive.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Everyone has an important role to play in increasing road safety; and WHEREAS, Passenger deaths accounted for 25 percent of all traffic fatalities nationwide in 2019; and WHEREAS, Traffic deaths increased 7 percent in 2020 and 18 percent in 2021 according to the National Highway Traffic Safety Administrations (NHTSA) preliminary estimates; and WHEREAS, Passenger vehicle occupant deaths rose 5 percent in 2020; andWHEREAS, These historic increases in traffic deaths occurred as there was a 13 percent decrease in vehicle miles traveled; andWHEREAS, NHTSAs data shows the main behaviors driving this increase were speeding, impaired driving, and failure to wear seat belts; and WHEREAS, Whether a driver is impaired by alcohol or drugs, speeding, driving too aggressively, or driving distracted, or the driver cannot stay awake at the wheel, bad driving choices put passengers at risk of serious injury or death; and WHEREAS, Many of those lives might have been saved had a passenger in the car insisted that the driver slow down, stop texting, or not get behind the wheel in the first place; andWHEREAS, Passengers, especially teens and young adults, need education and encouragement to empower them to save lives by calling out unsafe driving in the car as it happens; andWHEREAS, Parents also need education and encouragement to teach their children about the importance of speaking up or not getting in the car with someone who is drunk, drugged, or distracted; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That passengers in motor vehicles should be educated and encouraged to advocate for their own safety and the safety of others during National Passenger Safety Week, the week of January 23 to 29, 2022, inclusive, and throughout the year; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled February 25, 2022 Passed IN Senate February 24, 2022 Passed IN Assembly February 03, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 124Introduced by Assembly Member Fong(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Berman, Bloom, Boerner Horvath, Mia Bonta, Bryan, Calderon, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chen, Choi, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Megan Dahle, Daly, Davies, Flora, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Grayson, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, McCarty, Medina, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Nguyen, ODonnell, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Seyarto, Smith, Valladares, Villapudua, Voepel, Waldron, Ward, Akilah Weber, Wicks, and Wood)January 20, 2022 Relative to National Passenger Safety Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 124, Fong. National Passenger Safety Week.This measure would declare that passengers in motor vehicles should be educated and encouraged to advocate for their own safety and the safety of others during National Passenger Safety Week, the week of January 23 to 29, 2022, inclusive.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Everyone has an important role to play in increasing road safety; and WHEREAS, Passenger deaths accounted for 25 percent of all traffic fatalities nationwide in 2019; and WHEREAS, Traffic deaths increased 7 percent in 2020 and 18 percent in 2021 according to the National Highway Traffic Safety Administrations (NHTSA) preliminary estimates; and WHEREAS, Passenger vehicle occupant deaths rose 5 percent in 2020; andWHEREAS, These historic increases in traffic deaths occurred as there was a 13 percent decrease in vehicle miles traveled; andWHEREAS, NHTSAs data shows the main behaviors driving this increase were speeding, impaired driving, and failure to wear seat belts; and WHEREAS, Whether a driver is impaired by alcohol or drugs, speeding, driving too aggressively, or driving distracted, or the driver cannot stay awake at the wheel, bad driving choices put passengers at risk of serious injury or death; and WHEREAS, Many of those lives might have been saved had a passenger in the car insisted that the driver slow down, stop texting, or not get behind the wheel in the first place; andWHEREAS, Passengers, especially teens and young adults, need education and encouragement to empower them to save lives by calling out unsafe driving in the car as it happens; andWHEREAS, Parents also need education and encouragement to teach their children about the importance of speaking up or not getting in the car with someone who is drunk, drugged, or distracted; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That passengers in motor vehicles should be educated and encouraged to advocate for their own safety and the safety of others during National Passenger Safety Week, the week of January 23 to 29, 2022, inclusive, and throughout the year; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|