|
08/30/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 158, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2022
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4683.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8, be amended, and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2022
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4469.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2022
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|