California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR126 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2022

Chaptered

Bill August 30, 2022

Amended

Bill August 2, 2022
Bill June 6, 2022