03/28/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 24, Statutes of 2022. | |||
03/28/2022 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 03/21/2022 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3161.) | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | Introduced measure version corrected. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2022 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 3648.) | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3535.) (February 10). | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/03/2022 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/02/2022 | Introduced. To print. |