1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 131 CHAPTER 24 Relative to Wear Red Day and American Heart Month. [ Filed with Secretary of State March 28, 2022. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 131, Mia Bonta. Wear Red Day and American Heart Month.This measure would declare February 4, 2022, as Wear Read Day in California and would declare February 2022 as American Heart Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Cardiovascular disease affects men, women, and children of every age and race in the United States. From 2019 to 2020, deaths from heart disease increased by 4.8 percent, the largest increase in heart disease deaths since 2012, and stroke deaths increased in the same period by 6 percent. Cardiovascular disease continues to be the leading cause of death in the United States; and WHEREAS, In 2015, cardiovascular disease accounted for $555,000,000,000 in health care expenditures and lost productivity, and by 2035, cardiovascular disease will account for $1,093,900,000,000 in health care expenditures and lost productivity annually; andWHEREAS, The global COVID-19 pandemic poses significantly higher risk to individuals with cardiovascular disease and risk factors; and WHEREAS, Individuals in the United States have made great progress in reducing the death rate for cardiovascular disease, but this progress has been more modest with respect to the death rate for cardiovascular disease in women and minorities; and WHEREAS, Cardiovascular diseases are the number one killer of women in the United States, killing more women than all forms of cancer combined, and cardiovascular disease is the leading cause of maternal death in the United States. Simply put, heart disease is the number one killer of new moms; andWHEREAS, Women, especially Black and Hispanic women, are disproportionally impacted by heart disease and stroke, and research shows heart attacks are on the rise in younger women. Yet younger generations of women, Gen Z and Millennials, are less likely to be aware of their greatest health threat, including knowing the warning signs of heart attacks and strokes; and WHEREAS, The American Heart Associations Go Red For Women movement motivates women to learn their family history and to meet with a healthcare provider to determine their risk for cardiovascular diseases and stroke; and WHEREAS, As the trusted, passionate, and relevant force for change to eradicate heart disease and stroke in women, the American Heart Associations Go Red For Women remains steadfast and committed to meeting the comprehensive health needs of women at every life stage; and WHEREAS, By increasing awareness, speaking up about heart disease, and empowering women to reduce their risk for cardiovascular disease, we can save thousands of lives each year; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes February 4, 2022, as Wear Red Day in California, and urges all citizens to show their support for women and the fight against heart disease by commemorating this day by wearing the color red; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature recognizes the month of February 2022 as American Heart Month in California to raise awareness of the importance of the ongoing fight against heart disease and stroke; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled March 22, 2022 Passed IN Senate March 21, 2022 Passed IN Assembly February 22, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 131Introduced by Assembly Member Mia Bonta(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Bennett, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Boerner Horvath, Calderon, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chen, Choi, Cooper, Cunningham, Megan Dahle, Daly, Davies, Flora, Fong, Mike Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gray, Grayson, Holden, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Levine, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Nguyen, ODonnell, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Seyarto, Smith, Stone, Ting, Valladares, Villapudua, Waldron, Ward, Akilah Weber, Wicks, and Wood)February 02, 2022 Relative to Wear Red Day and American Heart Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 131, Mia Bonta. Wear Red Day and American Heart Month.This measure would declare February 4, 2022, as Wear Read Day in California and would declare February 2022 as American Heart Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Cardiovascular disease affects men, women, and children of every age and race in the United States. From 2019 to 2020, deaths from heart disease increased by 4.8 percent, the largest increase in heart disease deaths since 2012, and stroke deaths increased in the same period by 6 percent. Cardiovascular disease continues to be the leading cause of death in the United States; and WHEREAS, In 2015, cardiovascular disease accounted for $555,000,000,000 in health care expenditures and lost productivity, and by 2035, cardiovascular disease will account for $1,093,900,000,000 in health care expenditures and lost productivity annually; andWHEREAS, The global COVID-19 pandemic poses significantly higher risk to individuals with cardiovascular disease and risk factors; and WHEREAS, Individuals in the United States have made great progress in reducing the death rate for cardiovascular disease, but this progress has been more modest with respect to the death rate for cardiovascular disease in women and minorities; and WHEREAS, Cardiovascular diseases are the number one killer of women in the United States, killing more women than all forms of cancer combined, and cardiovascular disease is the leading cause of maternal death in the United States. Simply put, heart disease is the number one killer of new moms; andWHEREAS, Women, especially Black and Hispanic women, are disproportionally impacted by heart disease and stroke, and research shows heart attacks are on the rise in younger women. Yet younger generations of women, Gen Z and Millennials, are less likely to be aware of their greatest health threat, including knowing the warning signs of heart attacks and strokes; and WHEREAS, The American Heart Associations Go Red For Women movement motivates women to learn their family history and to meet with a healthcare provider to determine their risk for cardiovascular diseases and stroke; and WHEREAS, As the trusted, passionate, and relevant force for change to eradicate heart disease and stroke in women, the American Heart Associations Go Red For Women remains steadfast and committed to meeting the comprehensive health needs of women at every life stage; and WHEREAS, By increasing awareness, speaking up about heart disease, and empowering women to reduce their risk for cardiovascular disease, we can save thousands of lives each year; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes February 4, 2022, as Wear Red Day in California, and urges all citizens to show their support for women and the fight against heart disease by commemorating this day by wearing the color red; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature recognizes the month of February 2022 as American Heart Month in California to raise awareness of the importance of the ongoing fight against heart disease and stroke; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|