06/08/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 83, Statutes of 2022. | |||
06/08/2022 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 06/02/2022 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2022 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4057.) | ||
Senate | 05/31/2022 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2022 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2022 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2022 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 4566.) | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 28). | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2022 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2022 | Introduced. To print. |