1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 136 CHAPTER 83Relative to Missing and Murdered Indigenous People Awareness Month. [ Filed with Secretary of State June 08, 2022. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 136, Ramos. Missing and Murdered Indigenous People Awareness Month.This measure would designate the month of May 2022 as Missing and Murdered Indigenous People Awareness Month in California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, In 2016, 5,712 missing and murdered indigenous cases were reported to the National Crime Information Center; andWHEREAS, According to the federal Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, homicide is the second to seventh leading cause of death for indigenous women; andWHEREAS, According to a study conducted on behalf of the United States Department of Justice, in some tribal communities, indigenous women face murder rates 10 times higher than the national average. No such study exists for urban areas; andWHEREAS, Little data exists on the epidemic of missing and murdered indigenous people, and data that is available is incomplete and inadequate; andWHEREAS, The data that does exist on this issue focuses primarily on indigenous women living on reservations, despite approximately 70 percent of native people living in urban cities; andWHEREAS, According to the first report conducted by the Urban Indian Health Institute in 2018 on missing and murdered indigenous women in urban cities:(1) In 27 percent of the missing and murdered indigenous women cases, the victims were 18 years of age or younger.(2) The average age for missing and murdered indigenous women was 29.(3) California has the sixth highest death rate of indigenous women in urban cities; andWHEREAS, According to the most recent census data, California has the largest population of American Indians, more than any other state in the country; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, That the Assembly hereby designates the month of May 2022 as Californias Missing and Murdered Indigenous People Awareness Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled June 03, 2022 Passed IN Senate June 02, 2022 Passed IN Assembly May 05, 2022 Amended IN Assembly April 18, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 136Introduced by Assembly Member Ramos(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Berman, Bloom, Boerner Horvath, Mia Bonta, Calderon, Carrillo, Choi, Cooley, Cooper, Megan Dahle, Daly, Davies, Mike Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Eduardo Garcia, Gray, Grayson, Haney, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Lee, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Nguyen, ODonnell, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Seyarto, Smith, Stone, Ting, Valladares, Voepel, Ward, Akilah Weber, Wicks, Wilson, and Wood)February 09, 2022Relative to Missing and Murdered Indigenous People Awareness Month.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 136, Ramos. Missing and Murdered Indigenous People Awareness Month.This measure would designate the month of May 2022 as Missing and Murdered Indigenous People Awareness Month in California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, In 2016, 5,712 missing and murdered indigenous cases were reported to the National Crime Information Center; andWHEREAS, According to the federal Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, homicide is the second to seventh leading cause of death for indigenous women; andWHEREAS, According to a study conducted on behalf of the United States Department of Justice, in some tribal communities, indigenous women face murder rates 10 times higher than the national average. No such study exists for urban areas; andWHEREAS, Little data exists on the epidemic of missing and murdered indigenous people, and data that is available is incomplete and inadequate; andWHEREAS, The data that does exist on this issue focuses primarily on indigenous women living on reservations, despite approximately 70 percent of native people living in urban cities; andWHEREAS, According to the first report conducted by the Urban Indian Health Institute in 2018 on missing and murdered indigenous women in urban cities:(1) In 27 percent of the missing and murdered indigenous women cases, the victims were 18 years of age or younger.(2) The average age for missing and murdered indigenous women was 29.(3) California has the sixth highest death rate of indigenous women in urban cities; andWHEREAS, According to the most recent census data, California has the largest population of American Indians, more than any other state in the country; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, That the Assembly hereby designates the month of May 2022 as Californias Missing and Murdered Indigenous People Awareness Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|