08/30/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 159, Statutes of 2022. | |||
08/30/2022 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 08/23/2022 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/23/2022 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4983.) | ||
Senate | 08/22/2022 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/11/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). | ||
Senate | 08/02/2022 | In committee: Referred to suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/29/2022 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2022 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2022 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2022 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4472.) | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 25). | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2022 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2022 | Introduced. To print. |