California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR157 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 9, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 9, 2022

Chaptered

Bill August 19, 2022

Amended

Bill June 20, 2022
Bill March 28, 2022