1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 157 CHAPTER 134Relative to the Army Specialist Juan Miguel Mendez Covarrubias Memorial Highway. [ Filed with Secretary of State August 19, 2022. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 157, Salas. Army Specialist Juan Miguel Mendez Covarrubias Memorial Highway.This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 198 in the City of Hanford in the County of Kings as the Army Specialist Juan Miguel Mendez Covarrubias Memorial Highway. The measure would request that the Department of Transportation determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES Bill TextWHEREAS, United States Army Specialist Juan Miguel Mendez Covarrubias of Hanford, California, was killed in action on March 11, 2020, in a rocket attack on Camp Taji, Iraq; andWHEREAS, Mendez Covarrubias was assigned to 1st Battalion, 227th Aviation Regiment, 1st Air Cavalry Brigade, 1st Cavalry Division, Fort Hood, Texas; andWHEREAS, Mendez Covarrubias entered the United States Army in June 2018 as a signal support systems specialist; andWHEREAS, In March 2019, Mendez Covarrubias had been assigned to 1st Cavalry Division at Fort Hood; and WHEREAS, Mendez Covarrubias deployed in support of the Inherent Resolve mission in October, 2019; andWHEREAS, Mendez Covarrubias battalion commander recognized him as a cherished member of the unit; andWHEREAS, Specialist Mendez Covarrubias was a true warrior who will forever be remembered by all who knew him; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Highway Route 198, between 14th Avenue, postmile R14.767, and 18th Avenue, postmile R10.561, in the City of Hanford in the County of Kings as the Army Specialist Juan Miguel Mendez Covarrubias Memorial Highway; and be it furtherResolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost, to erect those signs; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled August 09, 2022 Passed IN Senate August 04, 2022 Passed IN Assembly August 08, 2022 Amended IN Senate June 20, 2022 Amended IN Assembly March 28, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 157Introduced by Assembly Member Salas(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Bennett, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Boerner Horvath, Mia Bonta, Bryan, Calderon, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chen, Choi, Cooper, Cunningham, Megan Dahle, Daly, Davies, Flora, Fong, Mike Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gray, Grayson, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Nazarian, Nguyen, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Santiago, Seyarto, Smith, Stone, Ting, Valladares, Villapudua, Voepel, Waldron, Ward, Akilah Weber, Wicks, Wilson, and Wood)March 09, 2022Relative to the Army Specialist Juan Miguel Mendez Covarrubias Memorial Highway.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 157, Salas. Army Specialist Juan Miguel Mendez Covarrubias Memorial Highway.This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 198 in the City of Hanford in the County of Kings as the Army Specialist Juan Miguel Mendez Covarrubias Memorial Highway. The measure would request that the Department of Transportation determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES Bill TextWHEREAS, United States Army Specialist Juan Miguel Mendez Covarrubias of Hanford, California, was killed in action on March 11, 2020, in a rocket attack on Camp Taji, Iraq; andWHEREAS, Mendez Covarrubias was assigned to 1st Battalion, 227th Aviation Regiment, 1st Air Cavalry Brigade, 1st Cavalry Division, Fort Hood, Texas; andWHEREAS, Mendez Covarrubias entered the United States Army in June 2018 as a signal support systems specialist; andWHEREAS, In March 2019, Mendez Covarrubias had been assigned to 1st Cavalry Division at Fort Hood; and WHEREAS, Mendez Covarrubias deployed in support of the Inherent Resolve mission in October, 2019; andWHEREAS, Mendez Covarrubias battalion commander recognized him as a cherished member of the unit; andWHEREAS, Specialist Mendez Covarrubias was a true warrior who will forever be remembered by all who knew him; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Highway Route 198, between 14th Avenue, postmile R14.767, and 18th Avenue, postmile R10.561, in the City of Hanford in the County of Kings as the Army Specialist Juan Miguel Mendez Covarrubias Memorial Highway; and be it furtherResolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost, to erect those signs; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|