04/16/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 16, Statutes of 2021. | |||
04/16/2021 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |||
Assembly | 04/12/2021 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2021 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2021 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 689.) | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 11). | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2021 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2021 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2021 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2021 | Introduced. To print. |