1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 23 CHAPTER 16Relative to Construction Industry Suicide Prevention Awareness Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State April 16, 2021. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 23, Villapudua. Construction Industry Suicide Prevention Awareness Day.This measure would promote awareness of the problem of suicide facing the men and women within Californias construction industry populations by proclaiming March 18, 2021, as Construction Industry Suicide Prevention Awareness Day in California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Suicide is a serious and tragic public health problem that is growing in the United States that can be prevented through increased awareness, resources, and proper treatment; andWHEREAS, Suicide affects all Americans, but data shows that our construction industry personnel, many of whom are also veterans seeking an opportunity to leverage their military construction skills, in California and the nation die by suicide at much higher rates than other populations; andWHEREAS, According to a recent study by the federal Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC), the suicide rate among working-age males, notably those between 16 and 64 years of age, increased 34 percent during the 2000 to 2016, inclusive, timeframe, and that the occupational group with the highest male suicide rate is construction and extraction; andWHEREAS, The CDC recommends fostering social connections and economic supports, thereby improving access to appropriate mental health and other resources and services, and encouraging at-risk individuals to seek mental health treatment, if necessary, without the stigma that sometimes goes along with it, to possibly decrease the number of suicides; andWHEREAS, The construction industry continues to seek better information about the root causes of the industrys too high suicide rates; and WHEREAS, This resolution endeavors to promote awareness of the problem of suicide and the particular epidemic facing the men and women within Californias construction industry populations and encourages our communities and the people of the State of California to work together to continue to educate the public on how to recognize the warning signs and improve the outreach to, and treatment of, these individuals at risk for suicide; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims March 18, 2021, as Construction Industry Suicide Prevention Awareness Day in California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled April 14, 2021 Passed IN Senate April 12, 2021 Passed IN Assembly March 18, 2021 Amended IN Assembly March 04, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 23Introduced by Assembly Member Villapudua(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Bennett, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Boerner Horvath, Bonta, Burke, Calderon, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chau, Chiu, Choi, Cooley, Cooper, Megan Dahle, Daly, Davies, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Lorena Gonzalez, Gray, Grayson, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Lee, Levine, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, Medina, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Nguyen, ODonnell, Patterson, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Seyarto, Smith, Valladares, Voepel, Waldron, Ward, Wicks, and Wood)February 08, 2021Relative to Construction Industry Suicide Prevention Awareness Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 23, Villapudua. Construction Industry Suicide Prevention Awareness Day.This measure would promote awareness of the problem of suicide facing the men and women within Californias construction industry populations by proclaiming March 18, 2021, as Construction Industry Suicide Prevention Awareness Day in California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Suicide is a serious and tragic public health problem that is growing in the United States that can be prevented through increased awareness, resources, and proper treatment; andWHEREAS, Suicide affects all Americans, but data shows that our construction industry personnel, many of whom are also veterans seeking an opportunity to leverage their military construction skills, in California and the nation die by suicide at much higher rates than other populations; andWHEREAS, According to a recent study by the federal Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC), the suicide rate among working-age males, notably those between 16 and 64 years of age, increased 34 percent during the 2000 to 2016, inclusive, timeframe, and that the occupational group with the highest male suicide rate is construction and extraction; andWHEREAS, The CDC recommends fostering social connections and economic supports, thereby improving access to appropriate mental health and other resources and services, and encouraging at-risk individuals to seek mental health treatment, if necessary, without the stigma that sometimes goes along with it, to possibly decrease the number of suicides; andWHEREAS, The construction industry continues to seek better information about the root causes of the industrys too high suicide rates; and WHEREAS, This resolution endeavors to promote awareness of the problem of suicide and the particular epidemic facing the men and women within Californias construction industry populations and encourages our communities and the people of the State of California to work together to continue to educate the public on how to recognize the warning signs and improve the outreach to, and treatment of, these individuals at risk for suicide; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims March 18, 2021, as Construction Industry Suicide Prevention Awareness Day in California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|