08/19/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 122, Statutes of 2022. | |||
08/19/2022 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 08/04/2022 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/04/2022 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4657.) | ||
Senate | 08/02/2022 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/02/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/01/2022 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/29/2022 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 07/14/2021 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 07/08/2021 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 07/08/2021 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2277.) | ||
Assembly | 07/06/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 5). | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2021 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2021 | Introduced. To print. |