|
08/30/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 168, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2022
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2022
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4881.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2022
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2022
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2022
|
Amended. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2022
|
Referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2022
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|