California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AJR29 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 14, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2022

Chaptered

Bill August 30, 2022

Amended

Bill August 11, 2022
Bill June 23, 2022
Bill May 18, 2022