LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2021-2022 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AR57
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AR57
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2021-2022 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AR57
Action History
Assembly
08/23/2021
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2479.).
Assembly
07/15/2021
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 15).
Assembly
07/12/2021
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Assembly
07/08/2021
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
Assembly
07/08/2021
Referred to Com. on RLS.
Assembly
06/28/2021
Introduced.