California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AR57 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 07/08/2021

                            Amended IN  Assembly  July 08, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION House Resolution No. 57Introduced by Assembly Members Choi and Quirk-SilvaJune 28, 2021Relative to military and veterans. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTHR 57, as amended, Choi. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, On June 25, 1950, North Korean forces invaded South Korea across the 38th parallel, thus beginning the historic Korean War. The violence immediately drew international attention; andWHEREAS, On June 27, 1950, President Harry S. Truman, consistent with the scope of United Nations Security Council Resolution 82, ordered United States air and sea forces, and eventually ground forces, to assist the Republic of Korea after the North Korean Peoples Army had crossed the 38th Parallel behind artillery fire; andWHEREAS, During the course of American involvement in the Korean War, 54,246 American lives were lost, of which 36,492 36,591 were direct casualties on Korean soil, 103,284 Americans were injured, 7,140 Americans were captured, and 8,177 Americans went missing; andWHEREAS, Our nations soldiers, ground troops, sailors, airmen, coast guards, and marines who fought and died defending the worlds model of freedom, democracy, and justice are deserving of lasting honor and enduring appreciation of all Americans; andWHEREAS, Koreans and Korean Americans should spearhead efforts to create a monument that honors the brave men and women who sacrificed their lives during the Korean War by designing, constructing, and overseeing a monument that acknowledges the extraordinary bravery of those American service members who lost their precious lives in Korea; andWHEREAS, This historic Korean War Memorial Monument Monument, will feature the inscribed names of all 36,492 36,591 soldiers who made the ultimate sacrifice while serving on the Korean Peninsula, 2,611 2,612 of whom were from California; andWHEREAS, The City of Fullerton and the Orange County Korean War Memorial Committee entered into a memorandum of understanding on November 5, 2019, to build the historic Korean War Memorial Monument in the northern part of Hillcrest Park, adjacent to the Duck Pond; andWHEREAS, Through this Korean War Memorial Monument there will be ongoing dialogue about the Korean Wars historical significance, while promoting awareness and reminding the public of the great sacrifice made by Americas fallen heroes; andWHEREAS, We recognize the Korean War Memorial Monument will be completed and honored on September 28th, 28, 2021; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, That the Assembly hereby strongly supports efforts to build the Korean War Memorial Monument and inscribe all 36,492 36,591 names of the fallen heroes; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Amended IN  Assembly  July 08, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION House Resolution No. 57Introduced by Assembly Members Choi and Quirk-SilvaJune 28, 2021Relative to military and veterans. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTHR 57, as amended, Choi. Digest Key

 Amended IN  Assembly  July 08, 2021

Amended IN  Assembly  July 08, 2021

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 House Resolution 

No. 57

Introduced by Assembly Members Choi and Quirk-SilvaJune 28, 2021

Introduced by Assembly Members Choi and Quirk-Silva
June 28, 2021

Relative to military and veterans. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

HR 57, as amended, Choi. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, On June 25, 1950, North Korean forces invaded South Korea across the 38th parallel, thus beginning the historic Korean War. The violence immediately drew international attention; and

WHEREAS, On June 27, 1950, President Harry S. Truman, consistent with the scope of United Nations Security Council Resolution 82, ordered United States air and sea forces, and eventually ground forces, to assist the Republic of Korea after the North Korean Peoples Army had crossed the 38th Parallel behind artillery fire; and

WHEREAS, During the course of American involvement in the Korean War, 54,246 American lives were lost, of which 36,492 36,591 were direct casualties on Korean soil, 103,284 Americans were injured, 7,140 Americans were captured, and 8,177 Americans went missing; and

WHEREAS, Our nations soldiers, ground troops, sailors, airmen, coast guards, and marines who fought and died defending the worlds model of freedom, democracy, and justice are deserving of lasting honor and enduring appreciation of all Americans; and

WHEREAS, Koreans and Korean Americans should spearhead efforts to create a monument that honors the brave men and women who sacrificed their lives during the Korean War by designing, constructing, and overseeing a monument that acknowledges the extraordinary bravery of those American service members who lost their precious lives in Korea; and

WHEREAS, This historic Korean War Memorial Monument Monument, will feature the inscribed names of all 36,492 36,591 soldiers who made the ultimate sacrifice while serving on the Korean Peninsula, 2,611 2,612 of whom were from California; and

WHEREAS, The City of Fullerton and the Orange County Korean War Memorial Committee entered into a memorandum of understanding on November 5, 2019, to build the historic Korean War Memorial Monument in the northern part of Hillcrest Park, adjacent to the Duck Pond; and

WHEREAS, Through this Korean War Memorial Monument there will be ongoing dialogue about the Korean Wars historical significance, while promoting awareness and reminding the public of the great sacrifice made by Americas fallen heroes; and

WHEREAS, We recognize the Korean War Memorial Monument will be completed and honored on September 28th, 28, 2021; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, That the Assembly hereby strongly supports efforts to build the Korean War Memorial Monument and inscribe all 36,492 36,591 names of the fallen heroes; and be it further

Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.