|
09/29/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 831, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 4847.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 18. Page 5821.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2022
|
Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 3880.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3540.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
April 25 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|