California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1061 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 18, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2022

Amended

Bill June 16, 2022
Bill May 19, 2022
Bill April 18, 2022
Bill March 9, 2022