|
09/19/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 449, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 5308.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 4. Page 3977.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3596.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 12. Noes 1. Page 3184.) (March 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|