California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1079 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2022

Amended

Bill June 29, 2022
Bill June 22, 2022
Bill May 23, 2022
Bill March 29, 2022