Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2022
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2022
|
June 15 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 3837.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3783.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2022
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
May 2 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3459.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
April 21 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3219.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Set for hearing March 24 in HOUSING pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|