California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1105 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2022

Amended

Bill June 30, 2022
Bill June 21, 2022
Bill June 20, 2022
Bill April 25, 2022
Bill April 18, 2022
Bill March 15, 2022