|
08/26/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 193, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5828.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2022
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3647.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3415.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|