Assembly
|
06/02/2022
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 3922.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3786.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2022
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3514.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3456.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Set for hearing April 26 in JUD. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
April 6 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|