California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1181 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2022

Amended

Bill August 23, 2022
Bill June 20, 2022
Bill June 15, 2022
Bill June 8, 2022
Bill March 15, 2022