|
09/29/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 839, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5272.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2022
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3824.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3544.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
April 28 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|