California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1194 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2022

Amended

Bill August 23, 2022
Bill June 22, 2022
Bill April 19, 2022