|
09/30/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 994, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5311.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2022
|
June 22 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2022
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3840.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3789.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2022
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3519.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
April 19 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|