California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1228 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2022

Amended

Bill August 18, 2022
Bill August 15, 2022
Bill April 18, 2022
Bill March 8, 2022