Assembly | 06/27/2022 | June 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2022 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2022 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2022 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 3902.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2022 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2022 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2022 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2022 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 3521.) (April 26). | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Set for hearing April 26. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |