|
09/15/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 334, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5133.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5829.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3583.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3203.) (March 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|