California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1299 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 15, 2022

Amended

Bill June 23, 2022
Bill June 20, 2022
Bill May 16, 2022
Bill March 31, 2022