|
07/22/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 146, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
07/22/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 4530.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 21. Page 5558.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2022
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 16. Page 5511.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2022
|
June 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2022
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 3874.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3792.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2022
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3519.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3326.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD., PUB. S., and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|