California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1327 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2022

Enrolled

Bill July 1, 2022

Chaptered

Bill July 22, 2022

Amended

Bill June 23, 2022
Bill June 15, 2022
Bill April 7, 2022