Senate | 05/19/2022 | May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2022 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2022 | April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2022 | Set for hearing April 25. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3293.) (March 31). | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Set for hearing March 31. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3167.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Set for hearing March 21. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |