California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1387 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2022

Amended

Bill August 25, 2022
Bill August 15, 2022
Bill March 10, 2022