|
09/29/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 850, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 4937.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 16. Page 5950.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/02/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2022
|
(Received at desk July 1 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(14)).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 3877.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3798.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2022
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3540.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3274.) (March 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Set for hearing March 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|