California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1479 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2022

Amended

Bill August 15, 2022
Bill August 2, 2022
Bill April 4, 2022
Bill March 21, 2022