Senate | 02/01/2022 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | May 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2021 | Set for hearing May 20. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2021 | April 5 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2021 | Set for hearing April 5. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 590.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Set for hearing March 23. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | March 16 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Set for hearing March 16. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2021 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2021 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 12. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2021 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |