LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2021-2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB220
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB220
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2021-2022 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB220
Action History
Senate
02/01/2022
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Senate
04/20/2021
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
Senate
01/28/2021
Referred to Com. on G.O.
Senate
01/14/2021
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 13.
Senate
01/13/2021
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.