California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB227 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2021

Amended

Bill June 23, 2021
Bill May 25, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021
Bill April 5, 2021
Bill March 4, 2021